EP0376942 - A METHOD AND AN ARRANGEMENT FOR FILLING SO-CALLED LARGE SACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARLSSON, Börje Hjälmarsvik Postlada 7178 S-732 00 Arboga / SE | [1990/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/28] | Representative(s) | Axelsson, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/28] | Axelsson, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg AB Box 27834 S-115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 88903448.4 | 08.04.1988 | [1990/28] | WO1988SE00175 | Priority number, date | SE19870001568 | 14.04.1987 Original published format: SE 8701568 | [1990/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8807965 | Date: | 20.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0376942 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376942 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/54, B65B1/04, E02F3/40 | [1990/28] | CPC: |
E02F3/963 (EP,US);
B65B69/0075 (EP,US);
B65G65/32 (EP,US);
Y10S37/903 (EP,US);
Y10S414/133 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABFÜLLUNG SOGENANNTER GROSSER SÄCKE | [1993/26] | English: | A METHOD AND AN ARRANGEMENT FOR FILLING SO-CALLED LARGE SACKS | [1990/28] | French: | PROCEDE ET AGENCEMENT DE REMPLISSAGE DE GRANDS SACS | [1990/28] |
Former [1990/28] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABFÜLLUNG SOGENANNTER GROSSEN SÄCKE | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 28.09.1989 | Examination requested [1990/28] | 11.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.1993 | CH | 30.06.1993 | IT | 30.06.1993 | LI | 30.06.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 30.06.1993 | |
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
IT | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 30.06.1993 | |
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/04] | CH | 30.06.1993 | |
LI | 30.06.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB0983681 ; | [A]US3773196 (SHEPHERD W); | FR2220425 [ ] (LIBRAWERK PELZ & NAGEL KG [DE]); | [A]FI58963B (LEINONEN HEIMO J); | [A]SE439621 (NORDSTROEMS LINBANOR AB [SE]) | [A] - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT 84-299354/48, SU 1082729 |