EP0307451 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LOCATING THE DIRECTION OF AN ATOMIC BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1992 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O.Box 45066 Los Angeles California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states HUGHES AIRCRAFT COMPANY 7200 Hughes Terrace Los Angeles, California 90502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEEL, Duncan, G. 4548 Breezewood Ct. Ann Arbor, MI 48103 / US | 02 /
TURLEY, R., Steven 119 Cathy Drive Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1989/12] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro, Alois-Steineckerstrasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 88903471.6 | 25.01.1988 | [1989/12] | WO1988US00187 | Priority number, date | US19870023844 | 09.03.1987 Original published format: US 23844 | [1989/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8807210 | Date: | 22.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0307451 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307451 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/29 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
G01N21/6402 (EP,US);
G01T1/2907 (EP,US);
G01J3/4338 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/12] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ORTUNG DER RICHTUNG EINES ATOMSTRAHLES | [1989/12] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LOCATING THE DIRECTION OF AN ATOMIC BEAM | [1989/12] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE LOCALISATION DE LA DIRECTION D'UN FAISCEAU ATOMIQUE | [1989/12] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.1988 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/12] | 29.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - Review of Scientific Instruments, vol. 15, no. 1, January 1985 American Institute of Physics (US) M.J. Verheijen et al.: "Accurate (0.25mrad) perpendicular alignment of a continuous-wave single-mode dye laser beam and an atomic beam", pages 62-65 | [A] - Journal of Physics E. Scientific Instruments, vol. 15, no. 11, November 1982 (Dorking, GB) M.J. Verheijen et al.: "An atomic-beam set-up for 0.5 MHz absolute frequency stabilisation of a single-mode CW dye laser", pages 1198-1206 | [A] - Optics Letters, vol. 5, no. 1, January 1980, Optical Society of America (US) G.C. Bjorklund: "Frequency-modulation spectroscopy: a new method for measuring weak absorptions and dispersions" pages 15-17 | [A] - Applied Physics Letters, vol. 39, no. 9, 1 November 1981 American Institute of Physics (US) J.L. Hall et al.: "Optical heterodyne saturation spectroscopy", pages 680-682 |