EP0362219 - ASYMMETRICAL DUAL INPUT AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON, William A. 1042 19th Avenue Southeast Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US | [1990/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1990/15] | Wayte, Dennis Travers BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88903718.0 | 08.04.1988 | [1990/15] | WO1988US01136 | Priority number, date | US19870036584 | 10.04.1987 Original published format: US 36584 | [1990/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808226 | Date: | 20.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0362219 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0362219 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.10.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/68 | [1990/15] | CPC: |
H03F1/302 (EP,US);
H03F3/183 (EP,US);
H04R25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | ASYMETRISCHER VERSTÄRKER MIT ZWEI EINGÄNGEN | [1995/25] | English: | ASYMMETRICAL DUAL INPUT AMPLIFIER | [1990/15] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR ASYMETRIQUE A DEUX ENTREES | [1990/15] |
Former [1990/15] | ASYMETRISCHER VERSTAERKER MIT DOPPELTEM EINGANG | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.1989 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.1989 | Search fee paid | 03.10.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 03.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.1995 | BE | 21.06.1995 | FR | 21.06.1995 | IT | 21.06.1995 | SE | 21.09.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 21.06.1995 | |
BE | 21.06.1995 | ||
IT | 21.06.1995 | ||
SE | 21.09.1995 | ||
FR | 17.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 21.06.1995 | |
BE | 21.06.1995 | ||
SE | 21.09.1995 | ||
FR | 17.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/18] | AT | 21.06.1995 | |
BE | 21.06.1995 | ||
SE | 21.09.1995 | ||
FR | 17.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 21.06.1995 | |
BE | 21.06.1995 | ||
SE | 21.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 21.06.1995 | |
SE | 21.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3436672 (DELAGRANGE ARTHUR D); | [A]US3679961 (HAMILTON DAVID C); | [A]US3996462 (FLETCHER JAMES C ADMINISTRATOR, et al); | [A]US4021749 (ISHIGAKI YOSHIO, et al); | [A]DE3142607 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS. vol. cas31, no. 1, January 1984, NEW YORK US pages 49 - 63; H.C.lIN: "Integrated Circuit Techniques" | International search | [A]US3260955 (OFFNER FRANKLIN F) |