EP0358683 - PHARMACEUTICAL SUBSTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BADMAJEW, Vladimir Lorstzingstrasse 19 D-5000 Köln 41 / DE | [1990/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/12] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/12] | Bauer, Wulf, Dr. Bayenthalgürtel 15 D-50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE | Application number, filing date | 88904207.3 | 13.05.1988 | [1990/12] | WO1988DE00285 | Priority number, date | DE19873716186 | 14.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3716186 | [1990/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808713 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0358683 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/78, // (A61K35/78, 33:08, 33:00, 31:60) | [1990/12] | CPC: |
A61K36/67 (EP);
A61K36/28 (EP);
A61K36/9064 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/28, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/67, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/9064, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1990/45] |
Former [1990/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTIKUM | [1990/12] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL SUBSTANCE | [1990/12] | French: | SUBSTANCE PHARMACEUTIQUE | [1990/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.1989 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 08.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 17.01.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, IT, LU, NL | 19.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/23] | 08.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.01.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.1990 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.1990 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |