EP0314810 - LASER OSCILLATOR AND METHOD OF PROVIDING LASER GAS TO SAID LASER OSCILLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/19] | LASER OSCILLATOR AND METHOD OF SEALING LASER GAS INTO SAID LASER OSCILLATOR | ||
[1993/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARUBE, Norio 1-9-28, Minamitsukushino Machida-shi Tokyo 194 / JP | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88904272.7 | 17.05.1988 | [1989/19] | WO1988JP00466 | Priority number, date | JP19870120904 | 18.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12090487 | [1989/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8809579 | Date: | 01.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314810 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0314810 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/02, H01S3/097 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
H01S3/0346 (EP,US);
H01S3/036 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/19] | H01S3/097 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/19] | Title | German: | LASER-OSZILLATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINFÜLLEN VON LASERGAS IN DEN OSZILLATOR | [1993/10] | English: | LASER OSCILLATOR AND METHOD OF PROVIDING LASER GAS TO SAID LASER OSCILLATOR | [1993/10] | French: | OSCILLATEUR LASER ET PROCEDE D'INJECTION D'UN GAZ PERMETTANT L'EFFET LASER DANS LEDIT OSCILLATEUR LASER | [1993/10] |
Former [1989/19] | LASER-OSZILLATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUM GASDICHTEN EINFÜLLEN VON LASERGAS IN DEN OSZILLATOR | ||
Former [1989/19] | LASER OSCILLATOR AND METHOD OF SEALING LASER GAS INTO SAID LASER OSCILLATOR | ||
Former [1989/19] | OSCILLATEUR LASER ET PROCEDE D'INJECTION ETANCHE D'UN GAZ PERMETTANT L'EFFET LASER DANS LEDIT OSCILLATEUR LASER | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.1989 | Translation filed | 16.02.1989 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.1989 | Search fee paid | 16.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/19] | 06.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS57134857U ; | [X]JPS5952888 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JPS61149361U ; | [X]JPS6348879 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JPS548997 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPS55124286 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]JPS60107877 (INOUE JAPAX RES); | [X]JPS637683 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [X]JPS639178 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [X]JPS6342189 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [X]JPS6348880 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]US3704428 (BARRY JAMES D, et al) | Examination | JPS548997 | JPS637683 | JPS639178 |