EP0346398 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A NODE TO OBTAIN ACCESS TO A BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | [1989/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONALDSON, Darrel, D. 119 Old Common Road Lancaster, MA 01523 / US | 02 /
GILLETT, Richard, B., Jr. 315 Pine Hill Road Westford, MA 01886 / US | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88904322.0 | 22.04.1988 | [1989/51] | WO1988US01358 | Priority number, date | US19870044490 | 01.05.1987 Original published format: US 44490 | [1989/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808579 | Date: | 03.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346398 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0346398 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/36 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
G06F13/364 (EP,US);
G06F13/36 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUGRIFF EINES KNOTENS AUF EINEN BUS | [1989/51] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A NODE TO OBTAIN ACCESS TO A BUS | [1989/51] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE SE RAPPORTANT A UN NOEUD PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR L'ACCES A UN BUS | [1994/25] |
Former [1989/51] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE SE RAPPORTANT A UN N UD PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR L'ACCES A UN BUS | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1989 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 24.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 22.06.1994 | LI | 22.06.1994 | NL | 22.06.1994 | SE | 22.09.1994 | [1995/15] |
Former [1995/05] | CH | 22.06.1994 | |
LI | 22.06.1994 | ||
SE | 22.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | CH | 22.06.1994 | |
LI | 22.06.1994 | Cited in | International search | [X] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, vol. 28, no. 12, May 1986 (New York, US), "High-Speed processor bus arbitration", pages 5329-5333 |