EP0362244 - EMBRYOS OF USEFUL PLANTS AS UPTAKE SYSTEM FOR EXOGENEOUS GENETIC INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Bunsenstrasse 10 D-37073 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TÖPFER, Reinhard Max-Planck-Institut für Züchtungsforschung Egelspfad D-5000 Köln 30 / DE | 02 /
SCHELL, Josef, S. Max-Planck-Institut für Züchtungsforschung Egelspfad D-5000 Köln 30 / DE | 03 /
STEINBISS, Hans-Henning Max-Planck-Institut für Züchtungsforschung Egelspfad D-5000 Köln 30 / DE | [1990/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/15] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88904525.8 | 20.05.1988 | [1990/15] | WO1988EP00452 | Priority number, date | DE19873717301 | 22.05.1987 Original published format: DE 3717301 | [1990/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8809374 | Date: | 01.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0362244 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0362244 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N15/87 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
C12N15/8206 (EP);
C12N15/87 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/15] | C12N15/00, A01H1/00, A01G7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/15] | Title | German: | EMBRYONEN VON NUTZPFLANZEN ALS AUFNAHMESYSTEM FÜR FREMDE GENETISCHE INFORMATION | [1990/15] | English: | EMBRYOS OF USEFUL PLANTS AS UPTAKE SYSTEM FOR EXOGENEOUS GENETIC INFORMATION | [1990/15] | French: | EMBRYONS DE PLANTES UTILES SERVANT DE SYSTEME DE CAPTAGE D'INFORMATION GENETIQUE EXOGENE | [1990/15] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1989 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1994 | [2000/06] | Cited in | International search | EP0241963 [ ] (CEN CENTRE ENERGIE NUCLEAIRE [BE]); | EP0267159 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al); | WO8301176 [ ] (INT PLANT RESEARCH INST [US]); | EP0164575 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) | [X] - Chemical Abstracts, Band 66, 1977 (Columbus, Ohio, US), D. Hess: "Genetic engineering and plant breeding - illusion and reality", siehe Seite 206 | [X] - J. Mol. Biol. Band 43, 1969, L. Ledoux et al.: "Fate of exogenous bacterial deoxyribonucleic acids in Barley seedlings", Seiten 243-262 | [X] - Naturwissenschaften, Band 59, 1972, Springer-Verlag, D. Hess: "Transformationen an horeren Organismen", Seiten 348-355 | [XP] - Science, Band 237, 1987, J. St. Schell: "Transgenic plants as tools to study the molecular organization of plant genes", siehe Seite 1176-1183 | [X] - Z. Pflanzenphysiol., Band 61, 1969, D. Hess: "Versuche zur Transformation an hoheren Pflanzen: Wiederholung der Anthocyan-Induktion bei Petunia und erste Charakteri-sierung des transformierenden Prinzips", Seiten 286-298 | [X] - Pflanzenphysiol., Band 94, 1979, J. Korohoda et al.: "High efficiency genetic transformation in maize induced by exogenous DNA", Seiten 95-99 | [X] - Plant Molecular Biology, Band 7, Nr. 1, 1986, Martinus Nijhoff Publishers (Dordrecht, NL), A.C.F. Graves et al.: "The transformation of Zea mays seedlings with Agrobacterium tumefaciens", Seiten 43-50 | [A] - Methods in Enzymology, Band 101, 1983, Academic Press Inc., G.-Y. Zhou et al.: "Introduction of exogenous DNA into cotton embryos", Seiten 433-481 | [A] - Nature, Band 249, 3. Mai 1974, L. Ledoux et al.: "DNA-mediated genetic correction of thiamineless Arabidopsis thaliana", Seiten 17-21 | [A] - Theoretical and Applied Genetics, Band 58, 1980, Springer-Verlag, V.N. Soyfer: "Hereditary variability of plants under the action of exegenous DNA", Seiten 225-235 | [A] - Chemical Abstracts, Band 76, 13. Marz 1972, (Columbus, Ohio, US), L. Ledoux et al.: "Fate of exogenous DNA in Arabidopsis thaliana. Translocation and integration", siehe Seite 68 | [A] - Chemical Abstracts, Band 90, 1979, 21. Mai 1979, (Columbus, Ohio, US), P. Tichy et al.: "Autoradiographic detection of the uptake of the label from bacterial 3H-DNA in relation to the kinetics of the mitotic cycle in barley embryos", siehe Seite 290 | Examination | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 86, 1977 (Columbus, Ohio, US), D. Hess, p. 206, abstract no. 13946p | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 76, 13 March 1972, (Columbus, Ohio, US), L. Ledoux et al., p. 68, abstract no. 54778x | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 90, 1979, 21 May 1979, (Columbus, Ohio, US), P. Tichy et al., p. 290, abstract no. 164890z | - Z. Pflanzenphysiol., vol. 94, 1979, J. Korohoda et al., pages 95-99 |