EP0290602 - PROCESS FOR SURFACE TREATING CLAY MINERALS AND RESULTANT PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.C.C. AMERICA INC. 5775 Peachtree-Dunwoody Road N.E. Suite 200 G Atlanta Georgia 30342 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states E.C.C. AMERICA INC. 5775 Peachtree-Dunwoody Road N.E. Suite 200 G Atlanta Georgia 30342 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICE, Camilla, Arlyn 217 East Church Street Sandersville, GA 31082 / US | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Bull, Michael Alan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | Bull, Michael Alan, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 88904900.3 | 23.12.1986 | [1988/46] | WO1986US02794 | Priority number, date | US19860933083 | 20.11.1986 Original published format: US 933083 | [1988/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8803869 | Date: | 02.06.1988 | [1988/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290602 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290602 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/42, C09C3/06, C08K9/02, C08K3/34 | [1991/21] | CPC: |
C08K3/346 (EP,US);
C08K9/02 (EP,US);
C09C1/42 (EP,US);
C01P2002/22 (EP,US);
C01P2004/32 (EP,US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/46] | B32B5/16, B32B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG VON KLEIMINERALIEN UND SO HERGESTELLTE ERZEUGNISSE | [1991/21] | English: | PROCESS FOR SURFACE TREATING CLAY MINERALS AND RESULTANT PRODUCTS | [1988/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT EN SURFACE DE MINERAIS A BASE D'ARGILE ET PRODUITS OBTENUS | [1991/21] |
Former [1988/46] | VERFAHREN ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG VON KLEIMINERALIEN UND SO HERSTELLTE ERZEUGNISSE | ||
Former [1988/46] | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT EN SURFACE DE MINERAIS A BASE D'ARGILE ET PODUITS OBTENUS | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.1988 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.1988 | Search fee paid | 13.07.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 26.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.1991 | BE | 22.05.1991 | CH | 22.05.1991 | IT | 22.05.1991 | LI | 22.05.1991 | NL | 22.05.1991 | SE | 22.05.1991 | FR | 11.10.1991 | [1999/42] |
Former [1992/30] | AT | 22.05.1991 | |
BE | 22.05.1991 | ||
CH | 22.05.1991 | ||
LI | 22.05.1991 | ||
NL | 22.05.1991 | ||
SE | 22.05.1991 | ||
FR | 11.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/25] | AT | 22.05.1991 | |
CH | 22.05.1991 | ||
LI | 22.05.1991 | ||
NL | 22.05.1991 | ||
SE | 22.05.1991 | ||
FR | 11.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/05] | AT | 22.05.1991 | |
CH | 22.05.1991 | ||
LI | 22.05.1991 | ||
NL | 22.05.1991 | ||
SE | 22.05.1991 | ||
Former [1992/04] | AT | 22.05.1991 | |
NL | 22.05.1991 | ||
SE | 22.05.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | AT | 22.05.1991 | |
SE | 22.05.1991 | ||
Former [1991/51] | SE | 22.05.1991 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4522958 (DAS SURYYA K [US], et al); | [A]US4559368 (HEINEN HANS-DIETER J [BE]) |