EP0321580 - NOVEL THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8205 / JP | ||
Former [1989/26] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASAI, Koji 1673-9, Kamikurata-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 244 / JP | 02 /
TSUNETANI, Masami 6-40-20, Kamiimaizumi Ebina-shi Kanagawa-ken 243-04 / JP | [1989/26] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/26] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 88905563.8 | 23.06.1988 | [1989/26] | WO1988JP00624 | Priority number, date | JP19870156581 | 25.06.1987 Original published format: JP 15658187 | JP19870159098 | 26.06.1987 Original published format: JP 15909887 | [1989/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8810285 | Date: | 29.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0321580 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0321580 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00, C08L53/02, C08L71/12 | [1998/52] | CPC: |
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L71/123 (EP,US);
C08L77/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L53/02, C08L2666/14 (EP,US);
C08L71/123, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/12] | C08L71/04, C08L77/00, C08L53/02, C08L71/12 | ||
Former IPC [1989/26] | C08L71/04, C08L77/00, C08L53/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/26] | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1989/26] | English: | NOVEL THERMOPLASTIC RESIN COMPOSITION | [1989/26] | French: | NOUVEAU COMPOSE A BASE DE RESINE THERMOPLASTIQUE | [1989/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.1988 | Translation filed | 18.07.1988 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.1988 | Search fee paid | 18.07.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/40] | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.12.1998 | FR | 30.12.1998 | IT | 30.12.1998 | [2008/01] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 30.12.1998 | |
FR | 30.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/22] | BE | 30.12.1998 | |
FR | 28.05.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 30.12.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [P]JPS62151456 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPS62127339 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [A]JPS6281449 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [P]JPS62253652 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD); | [A]JPS5649753 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) | Examination | EP0046040 | WO8505372 | WO8602086 | EP0225170 | JPS6043796 | JPS60295541 | - Experimental report of "BASF" filed in the opposition against EP-A-0269748 |