EP0319590 - HIGH-STRENGTH, COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET HAVING HIGH r VALUE AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/24] | HIGH-STRENGTH, COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET HAVING HIGH GAMMA VALUE AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION | ||
[1993/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, 2-chome, Ote-machi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states Nippon Steel Corporation 6-3, 2-chome, Ote-machi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHIDA, Koji, Nippon Steel Corp. Hirohata Works, 1, Fuji-cho, Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 6711-11 / JP | 02 /
AKISUE, Osamu, Nippon Steel Corp. Hirohata Works, 1, Fuji-cho, Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671 / JP | [1993/15] |
Former [1989/24] | 01 /
KISHIDA, Koji Nippon Steel Corporation Hirohata Works 1, Fuji-cho, Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 6711-11 / JP | ||
02 /
AKISUE, Osamu Nippon Steel Corporation Hirohata Works 1, Fuji-cho, Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88906042.2 | 27.06.1988 | [1989/24] | WO1988JP00640 | Priority number, date | JP19870157892 | 26.06.1987 Original published format: JP 15789287 | [1989/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8810319 | Date: | 29.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0319590 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319590 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/16, C21D8/04, C21D9/56 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
C22C38/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/24] | Title | German: | KALTGEWALZTER FEINBLECHSTAHL MIT HOHEM r-WERT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1993/15] | English: | HIGH-STRENGTH, COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET HAVING HIGH r VALUE AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION | [1993/15] | French: | FEUILLE D'ACIER LAMINE A CHAUD DE GRANDE RESISTANCE, PRESENTANT UNE VALEUR r ELEVEE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1993/15] |
Former [1989/24] | KALTGEWALZTER FEINBLECHSTAHL MIT HOHEN GAMMA-WERTEN UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [1989/24] | HIGH-STRENGTH, COLD-ROLLED STEEL SHEET HAVING HIGH GAMMA VALUE AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION | ||
Former [1989/24] | FEUILLE D'ACIER LAMINE A CHAUD DE GRANDE RESISTANCE, PRESENTANT UNE VALEUR GAMMA ELEVEE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1989 | Translation filed | 03.02.1989 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1989 | Search fee paid | 03.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 31.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2986483 (LESLIE WILLIAM C, et al); | [A]GB982448 (MOND NICKEL CO LTD); | [A]US3368886 (TORU MUTA, et al); | [A]US3917494 (KUBOTERA HARUO, et al); | [A]BE831561 ; | [A]FR2311096 (SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH [FR]) | International search | [X]JPH05976825 ; | [X]JPH05976824 ; | [X]JPH06115948 (TOYO GLASS CO LTD) |