EP0377580 - PACKAGE WRAPPING AND WEIGHING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PREMARK FEG CORPORATION 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 509 Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states PREMARK FEG CORPORATION 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 509 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | ||
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states PREMARK FEG CORPORATION Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, County of New Castle, Delaware / US | ||
Former [1990/29] | For all designated states Hobart Corporation World Headquarters Building Troy Ohio 45374 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREIBER, Fritz, F. 1480 Ambridge Road Centerville, OH 45459 / US | [1990/29] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/29] | Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys. Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr., Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 88906513.2 | 06.07.1988 | [1990/29] | WO1988US02270 | Priority number, date | US19870087924 | 21.08.1987 Original published format: US 87924 | [1990/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8901438 | Date: | 23.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0377580 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0377580 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/54, G01G19/40, G01G17/00 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
G01G19/40 (EP,US);
B65B11/54 (EP,US);
G01G17/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/29] | B65B1/46, B65B11/26, G01G23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/29] | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGS- UND WIEGESYSTEM | [1990/29] | English: | PACKAGE WRAPPING AND WEIGHING SYSTEM | [1990/29] | French: | SYSTEME D'EMBALLAGE ET DE PESEE DE COLIS | [1990/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.1990 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.1990 | Search fee paid | 08.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 18.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 22.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Request for further processing for: | 05.03.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.03.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.1990 | 01.08.1994 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2860867 (ALLEN KENNETH C, et al); | [A]US4078363 (RANZI MARILENA); | [A]US4415048 (TERAOKA KAZUHARU [JP]); | [A]US4458470 (FINE HARVEY A [US]); | [A]US4543766 (BOSHINSKI EDWIN E [US]); | [A]US4548024 (FINE HARVEY A [US]); | [Y]US4578926 (SATO HIROKAZU [JP], et al); | [YP]US4709531 (DENDA TOSHIO [JP]) | [AO] - Photographs of Waldyssa Wrapper with Bizerba Scale at Interpack Show in Germany, May, 1987. | [AO] - Promotional Literature- "Weldo Tron Model A4 Mini" (known to be prior to 21 August 1986). | [AO] - Literature and Photographs Distributed by Toledo Scale at the FMI Show in Chicago, Illinois, USA, May 1, 1987. |