EP0434675 - POLYPEPTIDE COMPOUNDS HAVING GROWTH HORMONE RELEASING ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYGEN HOLDING CORPORATION 1201 North Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19899 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states POLYGEN HOLDING CORPORATION 1201 North Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19899 / US | ||
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states Polygen Corporation 200 Fifth Avenue Waltham, MA 02254 / US | ||
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOWERS, Cyril, Yarling 484 Audubon Street New Orleans, LA 70118 / US | 02 /
MOMANY, Frank, Alden 1-1 Concord Green Concord, MA 02154 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Ching, Hsong 16 Robin Drive Fanwood, NJ 07023 / US | 04 /
CODY, Wayne, Livingston RD 2, Box 65 Ringoes, NJ 08551 / US | 05 /
HUBBS, John, Clark Rt. 10, Box 354 Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 06 /
FOSTER, Charles, Howard 1413 Dobyns Drive Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Davies, Jonathan Mark, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | Davies, Jonathan Mark, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1991/27] | Buff, Michel Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88906575.1 | 09.06.1988 | [1991/27] | WO1988US01947 | Priority number, date | US19870060877 | 12.06.1987 Original published format: US 60877 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8809780 | Date: | 15.12.1988 | [1988/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434675 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434675 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/06, C07K7/08, // A61K37/43 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
C07K14/60 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
Y10S930/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | POLYPEPTIDVERBINDUNGEN MIT WACHSTUMSHORMONFREISETZENDER AKTIVITÄT | [1991/27] | English: | POLYPEPTIDE COMPOUNDS HAVING GROWTH HORMONE RELEASING ACTIVITY | [1991/27] | French: | COMPOSES POLYPEPTIDES AYANT UNE ACTIVITE DE LIBERATION D'HORMONES DE CROISSANCE | [1991/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1989 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.11.1989 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 05.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0018072 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | [Y]WO8302272 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) | [X] - Endocrinology, Vol. 114, No. 5, F. A. Momany et al.: "Conformational Energy Studies and in Vitro and in Vivo Activity Data on Growth Hormone-Releasing Peptides", Pages 1531-1536. | Examination | - Endocrinology, Vol. 114, No. 5, 1984, F.A. Momany et al.: "Conformational Energy Studies in Vitro and in Vivo Activity Data on Growth Hormone-Releasing Peptides", pages 1531-1536 |