EP0328583 - IMPROVED COATED PCD ELEMENTS AND PRODUCTS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED 3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200 Houston TX 77027 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states BAKER-HUGHES INCORPORATED 3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200 P.O. Box 4740 Houston Texas 77210-4740 / US | ||
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED 3900 Essex Lane, Suite 1200, P.O. Box 4740 Houston, Texas 77210-4740 / US | ||
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street Worcester Massachusetts 01606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Sy-Hwa 7679 Brighton Way Salt Lake City, UT 84121 / US | 02 /
MERRILL, Leo 338 South 700 East Orem, UT 84059 / US | 03 /
BIGELOW, Louis, Kim 4499 Gilead Way Salt Lake City, UT 84124 / US | 04 /
SUNG, Chien-Min 12047 South Aspen Ridge Road Sandy, UT 84070 / US | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/34] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88906584.3 | 10.06.1988 | [1989/34] | WO1988US02037 | Priority number, date | US19870061705 | 11.06.1987 Original published format: US 61705 | US19870095054 | 15.09.1987 Original published format: US 95054 | [1989/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8809826 | Date: | 15.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0328583 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0328583 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C22C26/00, C09K3/14, B22F7/06, E21B10/46, B23P15/32, B24D18/00, C04B41/45, C04B41/52 | [1995/35] | CPC: |
E21B10/5676 (EP);
B22F7/06 (EP);
B23D61/04 (EP);
B23P5/00 (EP);
C04B41/4584 (EP);
C04B41/52 (EP);
C04B41/81 (EP);
C04B41/87 (EP);
C04B41/89 (EP);
E21B10/46 (EP);
B22F2005/001 (EP);
B23B2222/28 (EP);
B23B2226/315 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1989/34] | C22C26/00, C09K3/14, B22F7/06, E21B10/46, B23P15/32, B24D18/00, C04B41/85 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/34] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE POLYKRISTALLINE DIAMANTKÖRPER, PRODUKTE UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [1989/34] | English: | IMPROVED COATED PCD ELEMENTS AND PRODUCTS AND METHODS | [1989/34] | French: | ELEMENTS DE PCD (PRODUIT DIAMANTAIRE POLYCRISTALLIN) ENROBES AMELIORES, PRODUITS ET PROCEDES | [1989/34] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1989 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/34] | 16.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] | Request for further processing for: | 09.02.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 30.08.1995 | SE | 30.11.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [1996/14] | SE | 30.11.1995 | Cited in | International search | FR2169577 [ ]; | US2210039 [ ]; | BE460350 [ ]; | EP0046374 [ ] | Examination | EP0264674 |