EP0379488 - DEVICE FOR KEEPING A BAG MOUTH OPEN AND HOLDING THE BAG AGAINST A VERTICAL SURFACE OR A POLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blair, Norman 202 Old Glenarm Road Larne Northern Ireland BT 40 1TT / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | For all designated states Blair, Norman 202 Old Glenarm Road Larne Northern Ireland BT 40 1TT / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn, et al Forresters 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Gilmour, David Cedric Franklyn, et al POTTS, KERR & CO. 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 88906960.5 | 05.08.1988 | [1990/31] | WO1988GB00648 | Priority number, date | GB19870019643 | 20.08.1987 Original published format: GB 8719643 | [1990/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8901441 | Date: | 23.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379488 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379488 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65B67/12 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
B65B67/12 (EP,US);
B65F1/1415 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1990/31] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM OFFENHALTEN EINES BEUTELS UND ZUM HALTEN DESSELBEN AN EINER VERTIKALEN WAND ODER EINEM PFOSTEN | [1990/31] | English: | DEVICE FOR KEEPING A BAG MOUTH OPEN AND HOLDING THE BAG AGAINST A VERTICAL SURFACE OR A POLE | [1990/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF SERVANT A MAINTENIR OUVERTE L'OUVERTURE D'UN SAC ET A TENIR LE SAC POSE CONTRE UNE SURFACE VERTICALE OU UN MONTANT | [1990/31] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.1990 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 08.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 25.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.1991 | 02.09.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.1992 | 31.08.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.1993 | 31.08.1993 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   08.02.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.07.1994 | IT | 13.07.1994 | DE | 14.10.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 13.07.1994 | |
DE | 14.10.1994 | ||
FR | 09.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/28] | DE | 14.10.1994 | |
FR | 09.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | DE | 14.10.1994 | Cited in | International search | DE801080 [ ] (CHRISTOPH THEODOR); | US3233644 [ ] (BONO JOSEPH J); | US3532314 [ ] (VOSBIKIAN MANUEL); | US3627243 [ ] (FARRELLI KAI ROPCHE); | US3916962 [ ] (STOLT RANDOLPH) |