EP0380503 - BUILDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/32] | METHODS OF BUILDING CONSTRUCTION | ||
[1994/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORCE 10 HOLDINGS PTY LTD 30 Palings Court Nerang, QLD 4211 / AU | [1990/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAZLEY, Mark, Daniel 30 Palings Court Nerang, QLD 4211 / AU | 02 /
STUART, Gordon 10 Sterculia Street Holland Park, QLD 4121 / AU | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Hulse, Thomas Arnold, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Hulse, Thomas Arnold, et al Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 88907170.0 | 12.08.1988 | [1990/32] | WO1988AU00297 | Priority number, date | AU1987PI03703 | 13.08.1987 Original published format: AU PI370387 | AU1988PI07287 | 17.03.1988 Original published format: AU PI728788 | AU1988PI07288 | 17.03.1988 Original published format: AU PI728888 | AU1988PI07863 | 22.04.1988 Original published format: AU PI786388 | AU1988PI08404 | 24.05.1988 Original published format: AU PI840488 | [1994/23] |
Former [1990/32] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8901549 | Date: | 23.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0380503 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0380503 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.02.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/343, E04C3/07, E04C3/11, E04B5/43 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
E04B7/02 (EP,US);
E04B1/38 (KR);
E04B1/34315 (EP,US);
E04B7/06 (EP,US);
E04B7/063 (EP,US);
E04C3/07 (EP,US);
E04C3/11 (EP,US);
E04C2003/0413 (EP,US);
E04C2003/0417 (EP,US);
E04C2003/0421 (EP,US);
E04C2003/0434 (EP,US);
E04C2003/0452 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/32] | Title | German: | GEBÄUDE | [1994/23] | English: | BUILDING | [1994/23] | French: | BATIMENT | [1994/23] |
Former [1990/32] | GEN KODIEREND FÜR PROTEINANTIGENE VON PLASMODIUM FALCIPARUM | ||
Former [1990/32] | METHODS OF BUILDING CONSTRUCTION | ||
Former [1990/32] | PROCEDES DE CONSTRUCTION UTILISES DANS LE BATIMENT | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.1990 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.1990 | Search fee paid | 11.01.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 05.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Request for further processing for: | 31.03.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.04.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.1994 | CH | 08.06.1994 | LI | 08.06.1994 | LU | 31.08.1994 | [2000/06] |
Former [1995/15] | AT | 08.06.1994 | |
CH | 08.06.1994 | ||
LI | 08.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | CH | 08.06.1994 | |
LI | 08.06.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | US1793188 [ ] (NOERENBERG CLARENCE E); | US2856039 [ ] (HAWKINSON HAROLD G); | FR1294119 [ ] | [A] - C.S.T.B. / BULLETIN MENSUEL DES AVIS TECHNIQUES, no. 279, May 1987, Paris, FR, Avis Technique 2/86-131 PBR systeme | International search | [A]US3971172 ; | [A]US3886699 ; | [A]US3236014 ; | [A]GB2057529 ; | [A]GB1529432 ; | [A]DE1684544 ; | [X]GB561506 ; | [Y]US1964403 ; | [Y]GB2171731 ; | [Y]DE3540027 ; | [A]GB2164966 ; | [X]AU4754785 ; | [X]AU2119383 ; | [X]US4435940 | Examination | US3456971 | CH569161 | US3949533 | GB2167463 |