EP0310684 - COFFEE-MILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.1992 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.1992 [1992/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LVOVSKOE TSENTRALNOE KONSTRUKTORSKO- TEKHNOLOGICHESKOE BJURO KIEVSKOGO NAUCHNO- PROIZVODSTVENNOGO OBIEDINENIA ELEKTROBYTPRIBOR ul. Kvitova 12 Lvov, 290019 / SU | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states LVOVSKOE TSENTRALNOE KONSTRUKTORSKO-TEKHNOLOGICHESKOE BJURO KIEVSKOGO NAUCHNO-PROIZVODSTVENNOGO OBIEDINENIA 'ELEKTROBYTPRIBOR' ul. Kvitova 12 Lvov, 290019 / SU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLYAKOV, Vladimir Alexandrovich ul. Vyshenskogo, 13-4 Lvov, 290010 / SU | 02 /
CHMYR, Roman Ivanovich ul. Ivana Franko, 23-31 Lvov, 290005 / SU | 03 /
LAVROV, Anatoly Fedorovich ul. Kovpaka, 19-82 Lvov, 290068 / SU | 04 /
Strezova, Ljudmila Kristovna pr. Pobedy, 31-35 Lvov, 290054 / SU | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Zellentin & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Nigerstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Zweibrückenstrasse 15 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88907180.9 | 17.12.1987 | [1989/15] | WO1987SU00148 | Priority number, date | SU19874211531 | 19.03.1987 Original published format: SU 4211531 | [1989/15] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8806858 | Date: | 22.09.1988 | [1988/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0310684 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47J42/30 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
A47J42/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/15] | Title | German: | KAFFEEMÜHLE | [1989/15] | English: | COFFEE-MILL | [1989/15] | French: | MOULIN A CAFE | [1989/15] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.1988 | Translation filed | 08.12.1988 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1988 | Search fee paid | 08.12.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 15.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/10] | 30.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - Keine Entgegenhaltungen. | International search | [A]FR2170837 (MOULINEX SA [FR]); | [A]DE2256348 ; | [A]SU1159551 (KI VNII TEKHN ESTETIKI [SU], et al) |