EP0375714 - LOUDSPEAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTRÖM, Thomas Kebnekaisevägen 9 S-161 33 Bromma / SE | [1990/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Delhage, Einar, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB Sankt Paulsgatan 1 116 47 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Delhage, Einar, et al Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB Sankt Paulsgatan 1 S-116 47 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 88907419.1 | 22.08.1988 | [1990/27] | WO1988SE00428 | Priority number, date | SE19870003252 | 21.08.1987 Original published format: SE 8703252 | SE19870004844 | 03.12.1987 Original published format: SE 8704844 | SE19880002928 | 18.08.1988 Original published format: SE 8802928 | [1990/27] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8901728 | Date: | 23.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375714 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375714 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/28 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
H04R1/2826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/27] | Title | German: | LAUTSPRECHER | [1990/27] | English: | LOUDSPEAKER | [1990/27] | French: | HAUT-PARLEUR | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.1989 | Translation filed | 16.02.1990 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 16.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 01.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.03.1993 | DE | 31.03.1993 | FR | 31.03.1993 | IT | 31.03.1993 | LI | 31.03.1993 | NL | 31.03.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | CH | 31.03.1993 | |
DE | 31.03.1993 | ||
IT | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
NL | 31.03.1993 | ||
FR | 20.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | CH | 31.03.1993 | |
DE | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
NL | 31.03.1993 | ||
FR | 20.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/03] | CH | 31.03.1993 | |
DE | 31.03.1993 | ||
LI | 31.03.1993 | ||
NL | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1994/03] | DE | 31.03.1993 | |
NL | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/51] | NL | 31.03.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1377029 ; | [A]FR2312909 (SETTON JACK [FR]); | [A]FR2372566 (3A ART ACOUSTIQUE APPLIQUEE SA [FR]); | [A]US2979150 (IRBY JR JESSE C); | [A]US3076520 (FARWELL CLAUDE C) |