EP0391905 - Use of disaccharide polysulfate-aluminium compound in the manufacture of a medicament for treating HEMORRHOIDs and for wound healing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/42] | HEMORRHOIDAL, OTHER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT | ||
[1997/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACKMAN, Elias W. 214 Sycamore Avenue Merion, PA 19066 / US | [1990/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17, avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Michel Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17 Avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1993/26] | Poupon, Michel B.P. 421 3, rue Ferdinand Brunot F-88011 Epinal Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1990/42] | Poupon, Michel B.P. 421 3, rue Ferdinand Brunot F-88011 Epinal Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88907455.5 | 06.07.1988 | [1990/42] | WO1988US02266 | Priority number, date | US19870070904 | 08.07.1987 Original published format: US 70904 | [1990/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8900047 | Date: | 12.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0391905 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0391905 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/715 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
A61K9/0031 (EP,US);
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/42] | Title | German: | Verwendung von einer Disaccharidpolysulfat-Aluminium Verbindung zur Herstellung eines Medikaments zur Behandlung von HÄMORRHOIDEN und zur Wundheilung | [1997/36] | English: | Use of disaccharide polysulfate-aluminium compound in the manufacture of a medicament for treating HEMORRHOIDs and for wound healing | [1997/36] | French: | Utilisation d'un disaccharide polysulfate aluminium pour la fabrication d'un médicament destiné au traitement des HéMORROiDES et pour la cicatrisation des plaies | [1997/36] |
Former [1990/42] | HÄMORRHOIDENZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND SONSTIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN SOWIE BEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [1990/42] | HEMORRHOIDAL, OTHER COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT | ||
Former [1990/42] | COMPOSITIONS HEMORROIDALES, AUTRES COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1990 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.1990 | Search fee paid | 05.01.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/42] | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 28.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 10.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Request for further processing for: | 12.07.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.08.1996 | Decision despatched | 10.07.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 13.08.1996 | Decision despatched | 24.03.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 06.06.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   19.09.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0136100 [ ] (MARION LABORATORIES INC [US]); | EP0230023 [ ] (MARION LABORATORIES INC [US]) | International search | [X]US3432489 (NITTA YOSHIHIRO, et al); | [Y]US4613498 (CROSBY FRANK [US]); | [Y]US4626433 (GROS CHESTER P [US]) | Examination | - American J. Surgery (1984), vol. 148, pp. 809-12 | - New England J. Medicine (1986), vol. 317(7), pp. 459-60 |