EP0322454 - ANALOG-DIGITAL CORRELATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O.Box 45066 Los Angeles California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states HUGHES AIRCRAFT COMPANY 7200 Hughes Terrace Los Angeles, California 90502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURNS, Richard, J. 6841 Valley Circle, 48 Canoga Park, CA 91307 / US | 02 /
GRIM, Kenneth, R. 11883 Maple Crest St Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | 03 /
LEVY, Miguel, E. 3088 Palo Verde Circle Camarillo, CA 93010 / US | [1989/29] |
Former [1989/27] | 01 /
BURNS, Richard, J. 6841 Valley Circle, 48 Canoga Park, CA 91307 / US | ||
02 /
GRIM, Kenneth, R. 12524 Westmont Drive Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | |||
03 /
LEVY, Miguel, E. 3088 Palo Verde Circle Camarillo, CA 93010 / US | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1989/27] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro, Alois-Steineckerstrasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 88907499.3 | 22.06.1988 | [1989/27] | WO1988US02159 | Priority number, date | US19870067193 | 29.06.1987 Original published format: US 67193 | [1989/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8900279 | Date: | 12.01.1989 | [1989/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0322454 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0322454 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06J1/00, G01S13/28 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
G01S13/288 (EP,US);
G06J1/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/27] | G01J1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/27] | Title | German: | ANALOG DIGITAL-KORRELATOR | [1989/27] | English: | ANALOG-DIGITAL CORRELATOR | [1989/27] | French: | CORRELATEUR ANALOGIQUE-NUMERIQUE | [1989/27] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.1989 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 07.04.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 04.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0094265 [ ]; | US4400790 [ ] | [X] - Wescon Technical Papers, Volume 20, no. 20, 1976, U. Strasilla: "A programmable binaryanalog correlator", pages 19/4-1 -19/4-14 see page 19/4-1, column 2, "General Descriptio" - page 19/4-3, column 2; figure 1 |