EP0333872 - Gripper for a robot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/39] | FORCE DETECTION APPARATUS USING RESISTANCE ELEMENT AND ITS APPLICATION | ||
[1995/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WACOH CORPORATION 73, Sugaya 4-chome Ageo-shi Saitama 362 / JP | [1990/04] |
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states OKADA, Kazuhiro 73, Sugaya 4-chome Ageo-shi, Saitama 362 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1995/34] |
Former [1989/39] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88908323.4 | 14.09.1988 | [1989/39] | WO1988JP00930 | Priority number, date | JP19870234589 | 18.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23458987 | JP19870234590 | 18.09.1987 Original published format: JP 23459087 | JP19880025320 | 05.02.1988 Original published format: JP 2532088 | JP19880144380 | 11.06.1988 Original published format: JP 14438088 | [1989/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8902587 | Date: | 23.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0333872 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0333872 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.03.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/18, G01L5/16, G01B21/20, B25J13/08 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
B25J15/0009 (EP,US);
B25J13/085 (EP,US);
G01L1/18 (EP,US);
G01L5/162 (EP,US);
G01P2015/084 (EP,US);
Y10S294/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/39] | Title | German: | Greifer für Roboter | [1995/34] | English: | Gripper for a robot | [1995/34] | French: | Pince du robot | [1995/34] |
Former [1989/39] | KRAFTMESSGERÄT MIT WIEDERSTANDSELEMENT SOWIE DESSEN ANWENDUNG | ||
Former [1989/39] | FORCE DETECTION APPARATUS USING RESISTANCE ELEMENT AND ITS APPLICATION | ||
Former [1989/39] | DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE FORCE UTILISANT UN ELEMENT RESISTANT ET SON APPLICATION | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.1989 | Translation filed | 17.05.1989 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.1989 | Search fee paid | 17.05.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 28.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 30.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Request for further processing for: | 13.01.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.08.1995 | IT | 23.08.1995 | DE | 24.11.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | CH | 23.08.1995 | |
FR | 23.08.1995 | ||
IT | 23.08.1995 | ||
LI | 23.08.1995 | ||
DE | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 23.08.1995 | |
IT | 23.08.1995 | ||
LI | 23.08.1995 | ||
DE | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [2000/50] | IT | 23.08.1995 | |
CH | 23.10.1995 | ||
LI | 23.10.1995 | ||
DE | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 23.08.1995 | |
DE | 24.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | DE | 24.11.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60190828 ; | [X]JP57190241 ; | [Y]JP6184711 ; | [Y]JP61223626 ; | [Y]JP59155734 ; | [Y]JP60161539 ; | US4454771 [ ] (SHIMAZOE MICHITAKA [JP], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 45 (P-430)[2102], 21st February 1986; & JP-A-60 190 828 (FUJITA KOGYO K.K.) 28-09-1985, & JP60190828 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 38 (P-176)[1183], 16th February 1983; & JP-A-57 190 241 (KIYOUWA DENGIYOU K.K.) 22-11-1982, & JP57190241 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTSOF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 256 (P-493)[2312], 2nd September 1986; & JP-A-61 84 711 (FUJITSU LTD) 30-04-1986, & JP6184711 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 58 (P-550)[2505], 21st February 1987; & JP-A-61 223 626 (NEC CORP.) 04-10-1986, & JP61223626 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 6 (P-326)[1729], 11th January 1985; & JP-A-59 155 734 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 04-09-1984, & JP59155734 A 00000000 | [Y] - N.T.I.S. TECHNICAL NOTES, no. 2, part F, February 1986, page 188, Springfield, Virginia, US; "Force sensor for large robot arms" | [Y] - TRANSDUCERS '85, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID-STATE SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, 1985, pages 30-32; K. PETERSON et al.: "A force sensing chip designed for robotic and manufacturing automation applications" | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS IECON'86, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, CONTROL AND INSTRUMENTATION, Milwaukee, WI, 29th September - 3rd October 1986, pages 544-548; M. SUZUKI et al.: "Three kinds of dexterous hands for digitally controlled master-slave manipulator" | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 3 (P-418)[2060], 8th January 1986; & JP-A-60 161 539 (FUJI DENKI SOUGOU KENKYUSHO K.K.) 23-08-1985, & JP60161539 A 00000000 | International search | [Y]JPS4529076B ; | [Y]JPS60129635 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [X]JPS61105435 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPS61223626 (NEC CORP); | [P]JPS6372536U | Examination | US3509583 | FR2265135 | DE3008441 | DE3226386 | EP0133997 |