EP0380541 - CUTTING INSERT WITH CHIP CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. P.O. Box 231 Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIEBAUER, Kenneth, L. 5327 Collingwood Drive Raleigh, NC 27609 / US | 02 /
LOCKARD, Thomas, A. 501 Cedar Hill Lane Raleigh, NC 27609 / US | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88908463.8 | 26.07.1988 | [1990/32] | WO1988US02531 | Priority number, date | US19870093348 | 04.09.1987 Original published format: US 93348 | [1990/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8901836 | Date: | 09.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0380541 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0380541 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/22 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
B23B27/045 (EP,US);
B23B27/22 (KR);
Y10T407/2268 (EP,US);
Y10T407/2272 (EP,US);
Y10T407/235 (EP,US);
Y10T407/24 (EP,US);
Y10T407/25 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/32] | Title | German: | SCHNEIDEINSATZ MIT SPANKONTROLLE | [1990/32] | English: | CUTTING INSERT WITH CHIP CONTROL | [1990/32] | French: | PIECE RAPPORTEE COUPANTE A REGULATION DES COPEAUX | [1990/32] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/44: Teilanmeldung 94105465.2 eingereicht am 26/07/88 | EPB 1994/44: Divisional application 94105465.2 filed on 26/07/88 | EPB 1994/44: Demande divisionnaire 94105465.2 déposée le 26/07/88 | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.1990 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.1990 | Search fee paid | 02.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 30.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94105465.2 / EP0616867 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Request for further processing for: | 28.10.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 28.10.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 02.11.1994 | LI | 02.11.1994 | NL | 02.11.1994 | LU | 31.07.1995 | [2000/06] |
Former [1995/35] | CH | 02.11.1994 | |
LI | 02.11.1994 | ||
NL | 02.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/31] | CH | 02.11.1994 | |
LI | 02.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3301919 (KELLER WERNER); | [X]EP0138498 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [X]AT381262B (VER EDELSTAHLWERKE AG [AT]) | International search | [Y]US3754309 (JONES D, et al); | [Y]US4116576 (GAWRYK SR WILLIAM C); | [Y]US4626141 (MALAKER JOHN [US], et al) |