EP0330699 - MICROWAVE CIRCUIT MODULE, SUCH AS AN ANTENNA, AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.12.1990 [1990/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHASAR CORPORATION 12567 West Cedar Lakewood, CO 80226 / US | [1989/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHOEMAKER, Kevin, O. 601 Bear Creek Avenue Morrison, CO 80465 / US | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Maggs, Michael Norman Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | Maggs, Michael Norman Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88908572.6 | 09.09.1988 | [1989/36] | WO1988US02999 | Priority number, date | US19870094511 | 09.09.1987 Original published format: US 94511 | [1989/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8902662 | Date: | 23.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0330699 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/38 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
H01Q21/065 (EP,US);
H01Q21/0087 (EP,US);
H01Q25/001 (EP,US);
H01Q3/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | MIKROWELLENSCHALTUNGSMODUL, WIE EINE ANTENNE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [1989/36] | English: | MICROWAVE CIRCUIT MODULE, SUCH AS AN ANTENNA, AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [1989/36] | French: | CIRCUIT MODULAIRE A MICRO-ONDES, TEL QU'UNE ANTENNE, ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1989/36] | File destroyed: | 01.02.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.1989 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.1989 | Search fee paid | 16.05.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/51] | 25.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/47] | 23.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0200819 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 6TH EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, Rome, 14th - 17th September 1976pages 339-343; A.G. DERNERYD: "Microstrip array antenna" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, vol. AP-31, no. 6, part 1, November 1983, pages 949-955, IEEE, New YorkUS; P.C. SHARMA et al.: "Analysis and optimized design of single feed circularly polarized microstrip antennas" | International search | [A]US3541565 (ZISLER SIEGFRIED); | [Y]US3778717 (OKOSHI T, et al); | [Y]US3803625 (NEMIT J); | [Y]US4180817 (SANFORD GARY G [US]); | [Y]GB2131232 (ROGERS CORP) | [Y] - Microwaves and RF, February, 1987, R. BARCROTT, "Conductive Ink a Match for Copper Antenna"pages 87-90. |