EP0333820 - SYSTEM FOR ENROLLING ADVERTISING POSTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.1992 [1992/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOEPGEN, Heinz Liberme 16 B-4701 Eupen / BE | For all designated states VERMEULEN, Jean De Roest d'Alkemadelaan 5-59 B-2600 Berchem / BE | For all designated states WINKELMANN, Gerhard Brahmsweg 1 D-5014 Kerpen / DE | [1989/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Dellicour, Paul Office Dellicour Avenue Rogier 19/13 B-4000 Liège / BE | [1989/39] | Application number, filing date | 88908650.0 | 07.10.1988 | [1989/39] | WO1988BE00028 | Priority number, date | BE19870001141 | 07.10.1987 Original published format: BE 8701141 | BE19870001464 | 21.12.1987 Original published format: BE 8701464 | [1989/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8903570 | Date: | 20.04.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0333820 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0333820 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G09F11/18 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
G09F11/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/39] | Title | German: | WERBEANZEIGENABROLLGERÄT | [1989/39] | English: | SYSTEM FOR ENROLLING ADVERTISING POSTERS | [1989/39] | French: | SYSTEME DE DEROULEMENT D'AFFICHES PUBLICITAIRES | [1989/39] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.1989 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 24.10.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 08.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2205243 [ ] (SOLUPLA SA [LU]); | DE2514074 [ ] (HARDER HANS DIETRICH); | GB2131218 [ ] (OLD SIGN SERVICES LIMITED); | FR2371740 [ ] (MATRA ENGINS [FR]); | US4375730 [ ] (SANDERS CARLOS L, et al); | FR2471013 [ ] (BROUSSE J JACQUES [FR]); | FR1353043 [ ] (VOG SOC) |