EP0351422 - DEVICES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MICROFILM AND MICROFICHE RECORDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, p.l.c. 1 Stanhope Gate London W1A 1EH / GB | [1990/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Michael, George 8 Howards Thicket Gerrards Cross Buckinghamshire SL9 7NX / GB | 02 /
McARDLE, Ciaran, Bernard 39 Carriglea Firhouse Dublin 24 / GB | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Brian Richard, et al The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1994/32] |
Former [1990/04] | George, Sidney Arthur The General Electric Company p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | Application number, filing date | 88908967.8 | 05.10.1988 | [1990/04] | WO1988GB00819 | Priority number, date | GB19870023394 | 06.10.1987 Original published format: GB 8723394 | [1990/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8903578 | Date: | 20.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0351422 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11C13/08, G02F1/135 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
G02F1/135 (EP,US);
G11B7/25 (EP,US);
G11C7/005 (EP,US);
H04N1/2179 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1990/04] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MIKROFILMS ODER EINER MIKROKARTE | [1990/04] | English: | DEVICES AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MICROFILM AND MICROFICHE RECORDS | [1990/04] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES ARCHIVES SUR MICROFILMS ET MICROFICHES | [1990/04] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.1989 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 24.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/15] | 11.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/15] | Request for further processing for: | 26.03.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 10.01.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.04.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.12.1992 | 31.10.1993 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.1994 | 31.10.1994 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4440473 [ ] (SEKIMOTO SOUICHI [JP]); | FR2360145 [ ] (LABO ELECTRONIQUE PHYSIQUE [FR]); | EP0012651 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | US4643533 [ ] (ARMITAGE DAVID [US]); | EP0141512 [ ] (UNIV MANCHESTER [GB]); | EP0231856 [ ] (ROEHM GMBH [DE]); | EP0068939 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [A] - 1983 SID International Symposium, Digest of Technical Papers, edition 1, May 1983, Lewis Winner, (Coral Gables, FL, US), K. Kubota et al.: "An 8' x 8' display using a laser-addressed white-on-black mode liquid crystal light valve", pages 44-45 | [X] - Photographic Science and Engineering, volume 20, no. 6, November/December 1976, Society of Photographic Scientists and Engineers, K.F. Nelson: "Model for a photoconductor-liguid crystal image storage panel", pages 268-271 | [Y] - Ber. Bunsenges. Phys. Chem., volume 89, 1985, Verlagsgesellschaft mbH, (Weinheim, DE), G. K{mpf: "Polymere als Tr{ger und Speicher von Informationen", pages 1179-1190 |