EP0346478 - SWITCHING REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.11.1992 [1992/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Shigeo Fanuc Mansion Harimomi 7-305 3539-1, Shibokusa Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [1989/51] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88908980.1 | 18.10.1988 | [1989/51] | WO1988JP01059 | Priority number, date | JP19870274404 | 29.10.1987 Original published format: JP 27440487 | [1989/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8904083 | Date: | 05.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0346478 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.05.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/338, H02M3/28 | [1989/51] | CPC: |
H02M3/28 (EP,US);
H02M3/3385 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/51] | Title | German: | SCHALTREGULATOR | [1989/51] | English: | SWITCHING REGULATOR | [1989/51] | French: | REGULATEUR DE COMMUTATION | [1989/51] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.1989 | Translation filed | 21.07.1989 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.1989 | Search fee paid | 21.07.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/51] | 09.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5762774 ; | [X]US3889173 (KLUSMANN DONALD L, et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 140 (E-121)[1018], 29th July 1982; & JP-A-57 62 774 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 15-04-1982, & JP5762774 A 00000000 | International search | [X]JPS60128867 (SANKEN ELECTRIC CO LTD) |