EP0406237 - DIE-LESS DRAWING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U.S. AUTOMATION CO. 2727 Second Avenue Detroit, MI 48201 / US | [1991/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORODIN, Daniel, J. 25542 Green Court Warren, MI 48089 / US | [1991/02] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/02] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88909043.7 | 03.10.1988 | [1991/02] | WO1988US03413 | Priority number, date | US19870104684 | 05.10.1987 Original published format: US 104684 | [1991/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8902936 | Date: | 06.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0406237 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/46, C21D9/54 | [1991/02] | CPC: |
C21D1/20 (EP,US);
C21D8/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM GESENKFREIEN ZIEHEN | [1991/02] | English: | DIE-LESS DRAWING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [1991/02] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'EMBOUTISSAGE SANS MATRICE | [1991/02] | File destroyed: | 23.08.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.1990 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.1990 | Search fee paid | 02.11.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.06.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 03.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/44] | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.09.1990 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.1990 | 25.09.1990 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.1990 | 25.09.1990 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.1990 | 25.09.1990 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.1990 | 25.09.1990 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.1990 | 25.09.1990 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.1990 | 25.09.1990 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.1990 | 25.09.1990 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.1990 | 25.09.1990 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.1990 | 25.09.1990 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.1990 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.05.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   25.06.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3964938 (TOLLIVER WILBUR E, et al) | [Y] - Making, Shaping, and Treating of Steel 5th ed.(c) 1971, ed. H.E. McGANNON pp. 607-609, 1086, 1089, 1091, 1100-1103especially page 608. |