EP0424375 - MONOLITHIC CHANNELING MASK HAVING AMORPHOUS/SINGLE CRYSTAL CONSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATKINSON, Gary, M. 1012 7th Street, 15 Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 88909414.0 | 30.08.1988 | [1991/18] | WO1988US02961 | Priority number, date | US19870106285 | 09.10.1987 Original published format: US 106285 | [1991/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8903544 | Date: | 20.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0424375 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0424375 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/00 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
G03F1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/18] | Title | German: | MONOLITISCHE TUNNELMASKE MIT EINER AMORPHEN/EINKRISTALLINEN STRUKTUR | [1991/18] | English: | MONOLITHIC CHANNELING MASK HAVING AMORPHOUS/SINGLE CRYSTAL CONSTRUCTION | [1991/18] | French: | MASQUE DE CANALISATION MONOLITHIQUE AYANT UNE CONSTRUCTION DE CRISTAUX AMORPHES/MONOCRISTAUX | [1991/18] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.1989 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1989 | Examination requested [1991/18] | 10.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B, Volume 5, No. 1, January/February 1987, AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, (Woodbury, NY, US), E.J. PARMA Jr. et al., "Channeling Transmission of Protons Through Thin Silicon Membranes", pages 228-231. | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Volume 25, No. 11B, April 1983, (New York, US), E. BASSOUS et al., "Triple Layer System for High Resolution Microlithography", pages 5916-5917. | [Y] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, No. 274, February 1987, (New York, US), "X-ray Mask/Membrane Fabrication", page 116, Disclosure No. 27481. | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Volume 23, No. 10, March 1981, (New York, US), J.H. KELLER et al., "Fabrication Technique for an Ion Beam Lithography Mask in Tensile Stress", pages 4486-4488. | [Y] - EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, Volume 82, No. 1, May 1982, (Pennington, New Jersey, US), J. BARTELT et al., "Membrane Mask Considerations in Ion Beam Lithography", pages 454-455, Abstract No. 277. | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Volume 24, No. 12, May 1982, (New York, US), C.R. GUARNIERI et al., "Fabrication of an Improved Membrane Substrate", pages 6270-6271. | Examination | - IBM Technical Disclosue Bulletin, volume 24, no. 12, May 1982, (New York, US), C.R. Guarnieri et al.: "Fabrication of an improved membrane substrate", pages 6270-6271 |