EP0394294 - REINFORCED POLYMERIC ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE, INC. 1200 Firestone Parkway Akron, Ohio 44317 / US | [1991/40] |
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states HOLROYD ASSOCIATES LIMITED Hindley Business Centre, Platt Lane Hindley, Wigan, Lancashire WN2 3PA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLROYD, Eric 10 Arley End High Legh Knutsford Cheshire / GB | 02 /
PERKINS, David, John, Bridgwood 73 Childwall Lane Liverpool L25 1PN / GB | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Lambert, Peter Richard Piper Lambert 120 Queens Road Leicester LE2 3FL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | Dearing-Lambert, Peter Richard DEARING LAMBERT & CO. P.O. Box 8 109 High Street Ibstock Leicestershire LE6 1LJ / GB | ||
Former [1990/44] | Dearing-Lambert, Peter Richard Dearing-Lambert & Co. 109 High Street Ibstock Leicestershire LE6 1LJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88909575.8 | 14.11.1988 | [1990/44] | WO1988GB00987 | Priority number, date | GB19870026630 | 13.11.1987 Original published format: GB 8726630 | [1990/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8904772 | Date: | 01.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394294 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394294 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/26 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
B29D30/38 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B5/02 (US);
B60C9/263 (EP,US);
B32B2250/40 (US);
B32B2605/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT, LU, SE [1992/44] |
Former [1990/44] | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, SE | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKER POLYMERGEGENSTAND | [1990/44] | English: | REINFORCED POLYMERIC ARTICLE | [1990/44] | French: | ARTICLE POLYMERE RENFORCE | [1990/44] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.1990 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 10.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.10.1992 | SE | 28.10.1992 | LU | 30.11.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1994/18] | AT | 28.10.1992 | |
SE | 28.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | SE | 28.10.1992 | Cited in | International search | DE1033059 [ ] (DUNLOP RUBBER CO); | DE2118748 [ ]; | FR2132509 [ ] (KLEBER COLOMBES); | GB2085494 [ ] (BATES W & A LTD); | EP0206976 [ ] (APSLEY METALS LTD [GB]) |