EP0355127 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SEPARATING PHASES OF A MULTI-PHASE LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1996 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1997 [1997/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONOCO SPECIALTY PRODUCTS INC. 600 North Dairy Ashford Road Houston, TX 77252 / US | [1994/28] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states CARROLL, Noel "Strathalbyn" The Crescent Sassafras, VIC 3787 / AU | ||
For all designated states CARROLL, Robert Wilfred 90 Woodlyn Lane Bradbury, CA 91010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARROLL, Noel ''Strathalbyn'' The Crescent Sassafras, VIC 3787 / AU | 02 /
CARROLL, Robert, Wilfred 90 Woodlyn Lane Bradbury, CA 91010 / US | 03 /
KALNINS, Charles, Michael 14 Park Street Malvern, VIC 3144 / AU | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1990/09] | Geering, Keith Edwin REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 88909709.3 | 16.11.1988 | [1990/09] | WO1988AU00443 | Priority number, date | AU19870005522 | 19.11.1987 Original published format: AU 552287 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8904725 | Date: | 01.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0355127 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0355127 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 01.06.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B04C5/00, B04C5/30, B04C9/00, B04C11/00 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
B04C11/00 (EP,US);
B01D17/0214 (EP,US);
B01D17/0217 (EP,US);
B04C5/00 (EP,US);
B04C5/30 (EP,US);
B04C9/00 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2499 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PHASENTRENNUNG EINER MEHRPHASIGEN FLÜSSIGKEIT | [1990/09] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SEPARATING PHASES OF A MULTI-PHASE LIQUID | [1990/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SEPARATION DE PHASES D'UN LIQUIDE A PHASES MULTIPLES | [1990/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.1989 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.1989 | Search fee paid | 11.07.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 16.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1233738 ; | [Y]GB2106424 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [X]WO8404702 (CARROLL NOEL) | International search | [X]US2408250 (JOE CRITES); | [X]US2788087 (LENEHAN JOSEPH W); | [X]DE2152389 (KELLER FA OTTO); | [X]US3735869 (CARPENTER R D BISHOP, et al); | [X]FR2180821 (PARKER STE CONTINENTALE [FR]); | [X]AU3213184 (CARROLL NOEL) | [XP] - DERWENT ABSTRACTS Accession No. 88-219334/31, Class J01, SU,A, 1368044 (Mosciw Steel Alloys Inst) 23 January 1988 (23.01.88) | [X] - DERWENT ABSTRACTS Accession No. 87-071292/10, Class 41, SU,A, 1244101 (ESIPOVICHI YA) 15 July 1986 (15.07.86) |