EP0347442 - MODIFIED SILICA BASED CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.1998 [1998/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUM CHEMICAL CORPORATION 11500 Northlake Drive Cincinnati, OH 45249 / US | [1997/17] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states QUANTUM CHEMICAL CORPORATION (a Virginia corp.) 99 Park Avenue New York, NY 10016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUEHLER, Charles, K. 1617 Ranchview Drive Naperville, IL 60565 / US | 02 /
FRIES, Richard, W. 812 Buell Avenue Joliet, IL 60435 / US | 03 /
PULLUKAT, Thomas, J. 710 Charleston Lane Hoffman Estates, IL 60195 / US | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88909917.2 | 21.09.1988 | [1989/52] | WO1988US03258 | Priority number, date | US19870099190 | 21.09.1987 Original published format: US 99190 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8902446 | Date: | 23.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0347442 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347442 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/64, C08F10/00, C08F10/06, C08F10/08, C08F10/14 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,KR);
C08F4/64 (KR);
C08F10/06 (KR);
C08F10/08 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6545 (EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6555 (EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6565 (EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6574 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1996/36] |
Former [1989/52] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | AUF MODIFIZIERTE SILIKA BASIERENDER KATALYSATOR | [1989/52] | English: | MODIFIED SILICA BASED CATALYST | [1989/52] | French: | CATALYSEUR A BASE DE SILICE MODIFIEE | [1989/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.1989 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.1989 | Search fee paid | 19.05.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/52] | 14.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2184448 (MOBIL OIL CORP); | [XE]EP0244678 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) | International search | [X]US4565795 (SHORT JAMES N [US], et al); | [X]US4612299 (ARZOUMANIDIS GREGORY G [US], et al); | [X]US4647550 (KOHORA TADANAO [JP], et al); | [X]US4686199 (TACHIKAWA MAMORU [JP], et al); | [XP]US4738942 (NOWLIN THOMAS E [US]) |