EP0344251 - DEVICE FOR CYCLIC MODIFICATION OF THE DISTRIBUTION OF A PILE OF SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Licinvest AG Hartbertstrasse 9 CH-7002 Chur / CH | [1989/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACKERET, Peter Allmendstrasse 18 CH-8700 Küsnacht / CH | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 88910024.4 | 21.11.1988 | [1989/49] | WO1988EP01053 | Priority number, date | DE19873739500 | 21.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3739500 | [1989/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8904991 | Date: | 01.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344251 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344251 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03B23/02 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
B65H3/56 (EP,US);
G03B23/02 (EP,KR,US);
B65H3/02 (EP,US);
B65H3/46 (EP,US);
G02B27/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/49] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZYKLISCHEN UMSCHICHTEN EINES BLATTSTAPELS | [1989/49] | English: | DEVICE FOR CYCLIC MODIFICATION OF THE DISTRIBUTION OF A PILE OF SHEETS | [1989/49] | French: | MODIFICATION CYCLIQUE DE LA DISTRIBUTION D'UNE PILE DE FEUILLES | [1989/49] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1989 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 20.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 08.09.1993 | SE | 08.09.1993 | [1994/26] |
Former [1994/25] | NL | 08.09.1993 | Cited in | International search | FR2403574 [ ] (LICINVEST AG [CH]); | FR2454112 [ ] (LICINVEST AG [CH]); | WO8603029 [ ] (LICINVEST AG [CH]) |