EP0349613 - TIMING PROCESS WITH FIXED OR VARIABLE PAUSES AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BARJON, Frank 104, allée Bergson F-4200 Saint-Etienne / FR | For all designated states MONTMAYEUR, Bruno Les Résidences Vertes F-42270 Saint-Priest-en-Jarez / FR | [1990/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Dupuis, François Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville B.P. 203 42005 St. Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Dupuis, François Cabinet Laurent et Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville, BP 203 F-42005 St. Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88910065.7 | 04.11.1988 | [1990/02] | WO1988FR00539 | Priority number, date | FR19870015805 | 06.11.1987 Original published format: FR 8715805 | [1990/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8904513 | Date: | 18.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0349613 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G04G15/00, A63B21/00 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
A63B71/0686 (EP);
G04G15/006 (EP);
G07C1/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1990/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZEITMESSUNG MIT FESTEN UND EINSTELLBAREN RUHEZEITEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DESSELBEN | [1990/02] | English: | TIMING PROCESS WITH FIXED OR VARIABLE PAUSES AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME | [1990/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE CHRONOMETRAGE AVEC DES TEMPS DE REPOS FIXES OU VARIABLES ET LE DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN UVRE | [1990/02] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.1989 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 15.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 26.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/18] | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4632570 [ ]; | DE3445654 [ ]; | AT355895B [ ]; | US4283712 [ ]; | US3973251 [ ]; | WO8607644 [ ] |