EP0363444 - Valve for tar-sprayer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/16] | TAR-SPRAY WITH VALVE | ||
[1996/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BURGGRAAFF, Teunis Vogelenzangseweg 1B NL-4124 AS Hagestein / NL | [1990/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/16] | Application number, filing date | 88910138.2 | 02.11.1988 | [1990/16] | WO1988NL00046 | Priority number, date | NL19870002618 | 03.11.1987 Original published format: NL 8702618 | [1990/16] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8904399 | Date: | 18.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0363444 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0363444 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/17, F16K41/08, B05B1/32 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
F16K41/08 (EP);
B05B1/306 (EP);
E01C19/176 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/16] | Title | German: | Ventil für Teerspritzeinrichtung | [1996/52] | English: | Valve for tar-sprayer | [1996/52] | French: | Vanne pour pulvérisateur à goudron | [1996/52] |
Former [1990/16] | TEERSPRITZEINRICHTUNG MIT VENTIL | ||
Former [1990/16] | TAR-SPRAY WITH VALVE | ||
Former [1990/16] | PULVERISATEUR DE GOUDRON A VANNE | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.1989 | Translation filed | 02.08.1989 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/16] | 31.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 24.05.1993 | Appeal received No. T0930/93 | 12.07.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.10.1995 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1995/44] | 01.12.1995 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1995/48] | 22.02.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Request for further processing for: | 27.11.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 25.11.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.03.1992 | 30.11.1993 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   18.01.1994 | 30.11.1994 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.1996 | CH | 27.12.1996 | FR | 27.12.1996 | IT | 27.12.1996 | LI | 27.12.1996 | SE | 27.03.1997 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/32] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
CH | 27.12.1996 | ||
FR | 27.12.1996 | ||
IT | 27.12.1996 | ||
LI | 27.12.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
CH | 27.12.1996 | ||
IT | 27.12.1996 | ||
LI | 27.12.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
CH | 27.12.1996 | ||
LI | 27.12.1996 | ||
SE | 27.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 27.12.1996 | |
CH | 27.12.1996 | ||
LI | 27.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 27.12.1996 | Cited in | International search | DE828028 [ ] (KARL PETER MAY); | US4126321 [ ] (HARJAR MARTIN J, et al); | EP0116704 [ ] (DYNAPAC MASKIN AB [SE]); | GB2148150 [ ] (PHOENIX ENGINEERING COMPANY LI) |