EP0395688 - RAIL GRINDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LORAM MAINTENANCE OF WAY, INC. 3900 Arrowhead Drive Hamel Minnesota 55340 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states LORAM MAINTENANCE OF WAY, INC. 3900 Arrowhead Drive Hamel Minnesota 55340 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAD HEART BULL, Timothy Route 2 Box 180 Annandale, MN 55302 / US | 02 /
DZUBAK, Alan, L. 3501 N.E. Tyler Street Minneapolis, MN 55418 / US | 03 /
ISDAHL, Darwin, H. 3165 North Harbor Lane Plymouth, MN 55441 / US | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | Strehl, Peter Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | Strehl, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening u. Partner Postfach 22 14 55 D-80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88910229.9 | 14.10.1988 | [1990/45] | WO1988US03594 | Priority number, date | US19870109542 | 16.10.1987 Original published format: US 109542 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8903455 | Date: | 20.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0395688 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0395688 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.04.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E01B31/17 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
E01B31/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/45] | Title | German: | SCHIENENSCHLEIFVORRICHTUNG | [1990/45] | English: | RAIL GRINDING MACHINE | [1990/45] | French: | MACHINE DE MEULAGE DE RAILS | [1990/45] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1993/50: Teilanmeldung 92116283.0 eingereicht am 14/10/88 | EPB 1993/50: Divisional application 92116283.0 filed on 14/10/88 | EPB 1993/50: Demande divisionnaire 92116283.0 déposée le 14/10/88 | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.1990 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.1990 | Search fee paid | 27.04.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 13.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP92116283.0 / EP0524661 | EP92116284.8 / EP0528444 | Opposition(s) | 16.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.05.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   31.05.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.12.1993 | NL | 30.03.1994 | [1994/48] |
Former [1994/39] | NL | 30.03.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2056345 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ); | [X]GB2014067 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ); | [A]DE1085065 (SCHOERLING & CO WAGGONBAU) | International search | [X]CH616186 (SCHEUCHZER AUGUSTE LES FILS D [CH]); | [X]US4091578 (PANETTI ROMOLO); | [Y]US4115857 (PANETTI ROMOLO); | [A]US2741883 (ALFRED SCHEUCHZER, et al); | [A]US4584798 (RIVOIRE ALBERT [US]); | [A]US4622781 (VIEAU ROBERT G [US], et al); | [A]US4596092 (PANETTI ROMOLO [CH]); | [A]US4583327 (JAEGGI HANS P [CH]); | [A]US3888052 (PANETTI ROMOLO); | [A]US3707808 (DANKO R, et al); | [A]US3606705 (RIVOIRE ALBERT); | [A]US3358406 (SPENO JR FRANK, et al); | [A]US4615150 (PANETTI ROMOLO [CH]); | [A]US3423858 (SPENO MARTIN J); | [A]US4583895 (THEURER JOSEF [AT]); | [A]US4492059 (PANETTI ROMOLO [CH]); | [A]US4189873 (PANETTI ROMOLO [CH]) | [A] - Article Entitled "Computerized Switch Grinder" from Progressive Railroading, July 1986 page 50. |