EP0386111 - THERMOELECTRICALLY CONTROLLED HEAT MEDICAL CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANAND, Raj K. 210 Lincoln Street Worcester, MA 01605 / US | [1990/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANAND, Raj, K. 210 Lincoln Street Worcester, MA 01605 / US | 02 /
JOHNSON, Norman, J., E. 51 Asbury Street Lexington, MA 02173 / US | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | Bassett, Richard Simon, et al ERIC POTTER & CLARKSON St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 88910243.0 | 01.11.1988 | [1990/37] | WO1988US03893 | Priority number, date | US19870116526 | 02.11.1987 Original published format: US 116526 | [1990/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8904137 | Date: | 18.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0386111 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0386111 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B17/38 | [1995/13] | CPC: |
A61B18/082 (EP,US);
A61F7/12 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B2017/22001 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00047 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00083 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00095 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00285 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00726 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/087 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0071 (EP,US);
A61F2007/0075 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/37] | A61B17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/37] | Title | German: | THERMOELEKTRISCH GESTEUERTER KATHETER FÜR DIE WÄRMEMEDIZIN | [1990/37] | English: | THERMOELECTRICALLY CONTROLLED HEAT MEDICAL CATHETER | [1990/37] | French: | CATHETER MEDICAL THERMIQUE COMMANDE THERMOELECTRIQUEMENT | [1990/37] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.1990 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.1990 | Search fee paid | 26.04.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 26.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/37] | 06.06.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 06.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4483341 (WITTELES ELEONORA M [US]); | [Y]US4654024 (CRITTENDEN JAMES F [US], et al); | [Y]US4627436 (LECKRONE MICHAEL E [US]); | [X]US4519389 (GUDKIN TIMOFEI S [SU], et al); | [A]US4032363 (RAAG VALVO); | [A]FR2613611 (BAUMGARTEN FREDERIC [FR]); | [A]US3369549 (ARMAO THOMAS A); | [A]DE1912187 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT) | International search | [X]US4519389 (GUDKIN TIMOFEI S [SU], et al); | [Y]US3207159 (KAZUMA TATEISI); | [Y]US4528979 (MARCHENKO ALEXANDR T [SU], et al); | [Y]US4627436 (LECKRONE MICHAEL E [US]); | [Y]US4483341 (WITTELES ELEONORA M [US]); | [Y]US4032363 (RAAG VALVO); | [Y]US3502080 (HIRSCHHORN MAX L); | [A]US4654024 (CRITTENDEN JAMES F [US], et al); | [A]US4672962 (HERSHENSON HAROLD [US]) |