EP0393095 - VALVE ASSEMBLY FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.04.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT BERLIN UND MÜNCHEN Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-8000 München 2 / DE | [1990/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAKEMAN, Russell, J. 20 Evelyn Drive Newport News, VA 23602 / US | 02 /
SHEA, Stephen, F. 856 Harpersville Road Newport News, VA 23601 / US | [1990/43] | Application number, filing date | 88910264.6 | 12.10.1988 | [1990/43] | WO1988US03548 | Priority number, date | US19870114353 | 29.10.1987 Original published format: US 114353 | US19880233082 | 17.08.1988 Original published format: US 233082 | [1990/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8903927 | Date: | 05.05.1989 | [1989/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0393095 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/46 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
F01L1/16 (EP,US);
F01L1/46 (KR);
F02B1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | VENTILEINHEIT FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOREN | [1990/43] | English: | VALVE ASSEMBLY FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [1990/43] | French: | SOUPAPE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1990/43] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.1990 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 07.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.01.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/22] | 17.01.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2006844 ; | [A]DE1962916 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]US1427111 (KNUDSEN HANS L); | [A]US1064109 (TECKLENBURG CARL [DE]) |