EP0348462 - SURFACE MODIFIED OPTICAL LENS AND METHOD OF SURFACE MODIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IOPTEX RESEARCH INC. 1301 Optical Drive Azusa California 91702 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states IOPTEX RESEARCH INC. 1301 Optical Drive Azusa California 91702 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Amitava 1551 Rose Villa Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Gilholm, Stephen Philip Corporate Patents Department Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO1 5DF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | Gilholm, Stephen Philip Corporate Patents Department Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO1 5DF / GB | ||
Former [1990/01] | Cole, William Gwyn, Dr. Smith and Nephew Research Limited Gilston Park Harlow Essex CM20 2RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88910371.9 | 01.11.1988 | [1990/01] | WO1988US03878 | Priority number, date | US19870118198 | 06.11.1987 Original published format: US 118198 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8904330 | Date: | 18.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0348462 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348462 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.1989 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/00, C08F8/12, C08F8/30, C08F8/32, C08F8/34, C08F8/42 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
C08J7/12 (EP);
C08F8/00 (EP);
G02B1/043 (EP);
C08J2333/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F20/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/01] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHLICH MODIFIZIERTE LINSE UND VERFAHREN | [1990/01] | English: | SURFACE MODIFIED OPTICAL LENS AND METHOD OF SURFACE MODIFICATION | [1990/01] | French: | LENTILLE OPTIQUE A SURFACE MODIFIEE ET PROCEDE DE MODIFICATION DE LA SURFACE | [1990/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.1989 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.1989 | Search fee paid | 13.07.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 11.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0068800 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0192831 (BARNES HIND INC [US]) | International search | [A]US3029228 (GLAVIS FRANK J); | [Y]US3927206 (BLANK IZHAK, et al); | [A]US3949021 (KUNITOMO TETSUNOSUKE, et al); | [Y]US3957740 (BLANK IZHAK, et al); | [A]US4260715 (DE MONTIGNY ARMAND, et al); | [A]US4312725 (LOSHAEK SAMUEL, et al); | [A]US4332922 (KOSSMEHL GERHARD, et al); | [Y]US4419505 (RATKOWSKI DONALD J [US], et al); | [A]US4487905 (MITCHELL DARRELL D [US]); | [A]US4500695 (IVANI EDWARD J [US]); | [A]US4550139 (ARKLES BARRY C [US]); | [A]US4616045 (UPCHURCH BILLY T [US]); | [Y]US4687816 (LIN SHAOW B [US], et al); | [AP]US4734475 (GOLDENBERG MERRILL [US], et al); | [AP]US4761436 (KOHNO YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) |