EP0324368 - Quick release aerator for removing bulk material bridge formations in silos and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGRICHEMA Materialflusstechnik GmbH Poststrasse 20 D-55257 Budenheim / DE | [1989/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leibling, Udo Osterbergstrasse 41 D-6530 Bingen 1 / DE | [1989/29] | Representative(s) | Bockhorni, Josef, et al Bockhorni & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Bockhorni, Josef, et al Bockhorni & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/29] | Bockhorni, Josef, Dipl.-Ing., et al Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89100108.3 | 04.01.1989 | [1989/29] | Priority number, date | DE19883800114 | 05.01.1988 Original published format: DE 3800114 | [1989/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0324368 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0324368 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/70 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
B65D88/703 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GR, IT, LI [1989/45] |
Former [1989/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Luftstossgerät zum Beseitigen von Materialaufstauungen von Schüttgütern in Bunkern u. dgl. | [1989/29] | English: | Quick release aerator for removing bulk material bridge formations in silos and the like | [1989/29] | French: | Appareil pour impulsions d'air éliminant les formations du pont par matières en vrac dans les silos et autres choses semblables | [1989/29] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, ES, GB, LU, NL, SE | 30.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 16.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.04.1989 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.1989 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.1989 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.1989 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.1989 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.04.1989 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0202720 (TECH BUREAU KNOL B V [NL]); | [A]EP0248265 (AGRICHEMA MATERIALFLUSSTECHNIK [DE]) |