EP0330812 - Opener for packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Barbara Jill 10 Chatham Court Brookfield, Conn. 06804 / US | [1989/36] | Application number, filing date | 89100210.7 | 07.01.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | US19880162428 | 01.03.1988 Original published format: US 162428 | US19880219603 | 15.07.1988 Original published format: US 219603 | [1989/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0330812 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0330812 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/30, B65D75/70 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
B65D77/2028 (EP,US);
B65D75/70 (EP,US);
B65D2577/2008 (EP,US);
Y10S206/806 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Hilfsvorrichtung zum Öffnen von Verpackungen | [1989/36] | English: | Opener for packages | [1989/36] | French: | Dispositif d'ouverture pour un emballage | [1989/36] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 12.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 16.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 16.04.1994 | Appeal received No. T0538/94 | 09.06.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.12.1995 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1995/50] | 08.01.1996 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1996/02] | 16.02.1996 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1174250 ; | [Y]US3233821 (WILLIAM EHLERS OTTO); | [X]DE2417494 (WELLMAN LESTER R); | [A]EP0058859 (MEGA PROD VERPACK MARKETING [DE]); | [X]BE900921 (STAAR DEV CO SA); | [X]DE3330354 (FLIER GUSTAV) |