EP0452515 - Improvements in a fluid actuated clutch assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION 2655 N.W. Highway Southfield Michigan 48034 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION 2655 N.W. Highway Southfield Michigan 48034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ladin, Eli Moshe 1608 Morton Avenue Ann Arbor Michigan 48104 / US | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89100658.7 | 22.04.1983 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | US19820370710 | 22.04.1982 Original published format: US 370710 | US19830459184 | 19.01.1983 Original published format: US 459184 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0452515 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/08 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
F16D25/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsbetätigte Kupplungseinheit | [1991/43] | English: | Improvements in a fluid actuated clutch assembly | [1991/43] | French: | Unité d'embrayage à action fluidique | [1991/43] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1989 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 13.07.1989 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request rejected | 13.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 22.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/03] | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/03] | Appeal following examination | 12.09.1989 | Appeal received No. J0038/89 | 23.11.1989 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.07.1991 | Result of appeal procedure: allowance of appeal | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 16.01.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.1989 | 16.01.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.1989 | 16.01.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.1989 | 16.01.1989 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.1989 | 16.01.1989 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.1989 | 30.04.1995 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2815971 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) |