EP0378715 - Beverage container pressurizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boyd, Cecil 317 Fairground Road Neosho Missouri 64850 / US | For all designated states Brock, Judith 317 Fairground Road Neosho Missouri 64850 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states Boyd, Cecil 317 Fairground Road Neosho Missouri 64850 / US | ||
For all designated states Brock, Judith 317 Fairground Road Neosho Missouri 64850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boyd, Cecil 317 Fairground Road Neosho Missouri 64850 / US | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Bockhorni, Josef, et al Bockhorni & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Bockhorni, Josef, et al Bockhorni & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Elsenheimerstrasse 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/30] | Bockhorni, Josef, Dipl.-Ing., et al Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner, Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89100666.0 | 16.01.1989 | [1990/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0378715 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65B31/04 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
B65B31/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Unterdrucksetzen von Getränkebehältern | [1990/30] | English: | Beverage container pressurizer | [1990/30] | French: | Dispositif de pressurisation de récipients pour boisson | [1990/30] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 28.01.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/39] | 24.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.02.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4033091 |