EP0330826 - Use of pyridin-2-ethers or pyridin-2-thioethers with a nitrogen-containing cycloaliphatic ring as agents with an antidepressant activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.1991 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1991 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.1991 [1991/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTA Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Weismüllerstrasse 45 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE | [1989/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engel, Jürgen, Dr. Erlenweg 3 D-8755 Alzenau / DE | 02 /
Nickel, Bernd, Dr. Alleestrasse 35 D-6109 Mühltal / DE | 03 /
Szelenyi, Istvan, Dr. Händelstrasse 32 D-8501 Schwaig / DE | [1989/36] | Application number, filing date | 89101034.0 | 21.01.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | DE19883803135 | 03.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3803135 | [1989/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0330826 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0330826 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44, A61K31/445, A61K31/55, A61K31/46 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/445 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61K31/46 (EP);
A61K31/55 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/36] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Pyridin-2-ethern beziehungsweise Pyridin-2-thioethern mit einem stickstoffhaltigen cycloaliphatischen Ring als antidepressiv wirkende Arzneimittel | [1989/36] | English: | Use of pyridin-2-ethers or pyridin-2-thioethers with a nitrogen-containing cycloaliphatic ring as agents with an antidepressant activity | [1989/36] | French: | Utilisation des pyridine-2-éthers, respectivement pyridine-2-thioéthers avec un résidu cycloaliphatique renfermant de l'azote, comme agent antidépresseur | [1989/36] | File destroyed: | 16.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 09.10.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]EP0287908 (ASTA PHARMA AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0241428 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [AP]EP0278173 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]) | [Y] - ARCHIVES OF PHARMACOLOGY, Suppl. zu Band 332, 1986, DEUTSCHE PHARMAKOLOGISCHE GESELLSCHAFT, ABSTRACTS OF THE 27TH SPRING MEETING, Mainz, 11. - 14. M{rz 1986, Seite R 87Zusammenfassung Nr. 348; W. DIMPFEL et al.: "Radioencephalography in the rat as a pharmacological tool to characterize centrally acting analgesics (Tele-stereo-EEG)" | [Y] - R. BERKOW et al.: "The Merck Manual", Auflage 15, 1987, Seiten 1512-1532, Merck & Co., Inc., Rahway, NJUS | [YP] - ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, Band 321, Nr. 11, November 1988, Seiten 821-822DE; J. ENGEL et al.: "Synthese von C-Anpirtolin" | [T] - ARCHIVES OF PHARMACOLOGY, Suppl. zu Band 339, 1989, DEUTSCHE GESELLSCHAFT F]R PHARMAKOLOGIE UND TOXIKOLOGIE, ABSTRACTS OF THE 30TH SPRING MEETING, Mainz, 14. - 17. M{rz 1989, Seite R 98, Zusammenfassung Nr. 392; U. WERNER et al.: "Anpirtolinea new antidepressant drug acting via central 5-HT receptors" |