EP0329951 - Bed for supporting immobilized patients [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.1992 [1992/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schipke, Norbert Kolumbusstrasse 13 D-8450 Amberg / DE | [1989/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Schneck, Herbert, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Schneck, Herbert, Dipl.-Phys., Dr., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 D-90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89101065.4 | 21.01.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | DE19883806056 | 26.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3806056 | [1989/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0329951 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0329951 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/00, A61G7/04 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
A61G7/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/35] | Title | German: | Bett zur Lagerung immobiler Patienten | [1989/35] | English: | Bed for supporting immobilized patients | [1989/35] | French: | Lit pour supporter des patients immobiles | [1989/35] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 23.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/32] | 05.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.07.1991 | 31.01.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2520563 ; | [Y]AT376565B |