EP0326052 - Method of making a pressure sealing between two chambers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stoffel, Gerd In den Dorfäckern 21 D-78465 Konstanz / DE | [1989/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/31] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Postfach 12 50 78229 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer.nat. Dr. Peter Weiss & Partner Postfach 12 50 D-78229 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89101075.3 | 23.01.1989 | [1989/31] | Priority number, date | DE19883802314 | 27.01.1988 Original published format: DE 3802314 | [1989/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0326052 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0326052 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326052 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B21D51/26, B65D83/14 | [1990/35] | CPC: |
B65D83/62 (EP,US);
B21D51/24 (EP,US);
B21D51/2615 (EP,US);
B21D51/2623 (EP,US);
B21D51/2638 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/31] | B21D51/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Zweikammer-Druckkammer | [1989/31] | English: | Method of making a pressure sealing between two chambers | [1989/31] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un joint d'étanchéité entre deux chambres sous pression | [1989/31] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 27.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2140804 (SCAL GP CONDIT ALUMINIUM); | [X]US3974945 (BURGER NORMAN DONALD); | [X]FR2310287 (CEBAL [FR]); | [X]FR2342222 (RHENAG AG [CH]); | [X]EP0017147 (LECHNER GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US4308973 (IRLAND LEWIS F) |