EP0326903 - Overvoltage protective device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solleder, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Maxstrasse 6 D-8411 Hainsacker / DE | 02 /
Schmid, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. Neuprüll 20 D-8400 Regensburg / DE | [1989/32] | Application number, filing date | 89101139.7 | 23.01.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | DE19883803328 | 04.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3803328 | [1989/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0326903 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326903 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/24 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
H02H9/042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/32] | Title | German: | Schutzeinrichtung gegen Überspannungen | [1989/32] | English: | Overvoltage protective device | [1989/32] | French: | Dispositif de protection contre des surtensions | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 26.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 31.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3029453 (DEHN & SOEHNE [DE]); | [X]EP0071956 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]); | [AD]DE3522260 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0173016 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |