EP0329960 - Secured package integrity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cooper, Martin Howard 1904 Hampstead Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15235 / US | 02 /
Petrosky, Lyman Jay R.D. 2 Box 302 Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Patentanwälte Schroeter-Fleuchaus-Lehmann & Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Fleuchaus & Wehser Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89101212.2 | 24.01.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | US19880160438 | 25.02.1988 Original published format: US 160438 | [1989/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0329960 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0329960 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/24, B65D55/02 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
B65D55/028 (EP,US);
B65D5/4291 (EP,US);
Y10S206/807 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/35] | G08B13/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/35] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Sicherung eines Behälters | [1989/35] | English: | Secured package integrity | [1989/35] | French: | Dispositif pour mettre en sécurité un paquet | [1989/35] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 26.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/13] | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/14] | 21.11.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3766452 (BURPEE L, et al); | [Y]WO8502165 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]US4711368 (SIMONS LEON [US]); | [A]US4369557 (VANDEBULT JAN [US]); | [A]US4342988 (THOMPSON LEONARD K, et al) |