EP0332825 - Cellular data telephone and method for communicating data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/38] | Cellular data telephone system and cellular data telephone therefor | ||
[1995/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1989/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Freeburg, Thomas A. 416 North Belmont Avenue Arlington Heights Illinois 60004 / US | 02 /
Dautel, Donald F. 2047 Sandburg Court Glendale Heights Illinois 60137 / US | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link, Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | Hudson, Peter David, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89101552.1 | 30.01.1989 | [1989/38] | Priority number, date | US19880170224 | 18.03.1988 Original published format: US 170224 | [1989/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0332825 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0332825 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0332825 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22, H04B7/26 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
H04W76/20 (EP,US);
H04W88/16 (EP,US);
H04W92/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/38] | H04Q7/04, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/38] | Title | German: | Zellulares Datentelefon und Verfahren zur Datenkommunikation | [1995/37] | English: | Cellular data telephone and method for communicating data | [1995/37] | French: | Poste téléphonique cellulaire à transmission de données et méthode pour la transmission de données | [1995/37] |
Former [1989/38] | Zellulares Datentelefonsystem und zellulares Datentelefon dafür | ||
Former [1989/38] | Cellular data telephone system and cellular data telephone therefor | ||
Former [1989/38] | Système téléphonique cellulaire à transmission de données et poste téléphonique cellulaire à transmission de données pour ce système | Examination procedure | 29.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/26] | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.1995 | BE | 13.09.1995 | ES | 13.09.1995 | GR | 13.09.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 13.09.1995 | |
BE | 13.09.1995 | ||
GR | 13.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 13.09.1995 | |
BE | 13.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | BE | 13.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4012597 (LYNK JR CHARLES NELSON, et al); | [A]EP0048854 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]WO8600775 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | [A]GB2170977 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [AD]US4697281 (O'SULLIVAN HARRY M [US]) |