EP0327053 - Duplex stainless steel with high manganese [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Armco Inc. 705 Curtis Street Middletown Ohio 45043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states ARMCO Inc. 705 Curtis Street Middletown, Ohio 45043 / US | ||
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states ARMCO ADVANCED MATERIALS CORPORATION Standard Avenue Lyndora Pennsylvania 16045 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daniels, James A. 197 Timbertrail Loveland Ohio 45140 / US | 02 /
Douthett, Joseph A. 38 Heatherwood Court Monroe Ohio 45050 / US | 03 /
Tack, John G. 7425 Montcircle Middletown Ohio 45042 / US | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/32] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89101705.5 | 01.02.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | US19880152178 | 04.02.1988 Original published format: US 152178 | [1989/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327053 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0327053 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/58 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
A61F2/30771 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,US);
A61F2/3094 (EP,US);
A61F2/468 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30148 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30273 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30808 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30836 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30838 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30879 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30883 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30892 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30957 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3097 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/14] |
Former [1989/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Rostfreier Duplexstahl mit hohem Mangangehalt | [1989/32] | English: | Duplex stainless steel with high manganese | [1989/32] | French: | Acier inoxydable à structure duplex et à haute teneur en manganèse | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 26.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CS100589 ; | [A]CS101259 ; | [X]US2624670 (BINDER WILLIAM O, et al); | [A]FR2074865 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD); | [X]FR2119612 (ARMCO STEEL CORP); | [X]US3926685 (GUEUSSIER ANDRE, et al); | [A]FR2280714 (FIRTH BROWN LTD [GB]) |