EP0327956 - Method for inducing an electrical control signal in a device for the preparation of medicinal-therapeutic doses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENNEBERG & BRUNNER Entwicklungsbüro, Goldbachstrasse 3 D-97999 Igersheim / DE | For all designated states CARLE GMBH + CO. KG medizinische Geräte, Einrichtungen und Präparate, Beim Braunstall 4 D-97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE | [1989/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brunner, Elmar Steinstr. 9 D-6990 Bad Mergentheim / DE | 02 /
Henneberg, Fred Steinstr. 9 D-6990 Bad Mergentheim / DE | 03 /
Müller, Edgar Am Ring 26 D-6965 Ahorn-Schillingstadt / DE | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Tergau, Enno Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Tergau, Enno, Dipl.-Ing. Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1992/36] | Tergau, Enno, Dipl.-Ing. Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1989/33] | Tergau, Enno, Dipl.-Ing. Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89101777.4 | 02.02.1989 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | DE19883803674 | 06.02.1988 Original published format: DE 3803674 | [1989/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327956 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0327956 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, A61H33/04 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
G05D23/1913 (EP);
A61H33/04 (EP);
A61H2033/046 (EP);
A61H2033/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines elektrichen Steuersignals in einem Aufbereitungsgerät für medizinisch-therapeutische Packungsmassen | [1989/33] | English: | Method for inducing an electrical control signal in a device for the preparation of medicinal-therapeutic doses | [1989/33] | French: | Procédé pour produire un signal électrique de commande dans un appareil de préparation pour doses médicales et thérapeutiques | [1989/33] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 22.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 18.12.1991 | ES | 03.02.1992 | LU | 29.02.1992 | [2004/37] |
Former [1999/52] | SE | 18.12.1991 | |
LU | 29.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/28] | SE | 18.12.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA983012 (SIMON PETER J); | [A]US3994164 (REGENASS WILLY, et al); | [A]FR2378308 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]); | [A]EP0007928 (CRESS STEVEN B); | [A]DE3015226 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]EP0208256 (HONEYWELL BV [NL]) |