EP0331900 - Method and apparatus for capability control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/37] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clark, Carl Edward 46 Bart Drive Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US | 02 /
Ganek, Alan George 18 Pin Oak Lane Chappaqua, NY 10514 / US | 03 /
Mall, Michael Gerard 20 Square Woods Drive Lagrangeville, NY 10540 / US | 04 /
Page, David Richard 13 Sycamore Close Romsey Hants / GB | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/19] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/13] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | ||
Former [1989/37] | Rudolph, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland GmbH Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 89101790.7 | 02.02.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | US19880154685 | 10.02.1988 Original published format: US 154685 | [1989/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0331900 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0331900 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0331900 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F12/06, G06F12/10 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
G06F9/468 (EP,US);
G06F12/0292 (EP,US);
G06F12/1483 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/37] | G06F9/46 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Zugriffsrechtensteuerung | [1989/37] | English: | Method and apparatus for capability control | [1989/37] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la commande des droits d'accès | [1989/37] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4145738 (INOUE KOICHI, et al); | [A]EP0076097 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0176939 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AD]US4355355 (BUTWELL JUSTIN R, et al); | [AD]US4500952 (HELLER ANDREW R [US], et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 29, no. 12, May 1987, NEW YORK US pages 5306 - 5307; 'Method to access system control blocks using identifier tokens' | [A] - MICROPROCESSING AND MICROPROGRAMMING. vol. 11, no. 2, March 1983, AMSTERDAM NL pages 69 - 106; VAN RUMSTE: 'The iAPX432, a Next Generation Microprocessor' |